House | 03/28/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014. | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |