House | 06/02/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014. | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Reported favorably (5-0). | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |