House | 05/27/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |