House | 06/12/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/05/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/5/2014. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Rules suspended. |