House
|
06/01/2014
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 74, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|