House
|
06/09/2014
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/5/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 79, nays 14. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|