House | 06/02/2014 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2014. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |