House | 06/12/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 06/01/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 06/01/2014 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2014 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |