ENROLLED Page 1 of 2 Regular Session, 2014 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 30 BY REPRESENTATIVE PONTI A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON To commend Mr. and Mrs. Ray Gendron upon the celebration of their fiftieth wedding anniversary. WHEREAS, upon the celebration of their fiftieth wedding anniversary on April 4, 2014, it is appropriate to recognize and commend Ray and Claire Gendron; and WHEREAS, Joseph Ray Gendron and Claire Esther Campbell met through mutual friends and began dating in high school; and WHEREAS, Ray was the starting running back for the Edgard High School football team, and Claire was a majorette for St. James High School; and WHEREAS, upon graduation, Ray briefly attended Southeastern University and then transferred to Louisiana State University, where Claire was a student and also an LSU Golden Girl from 1962-1963; and WHEREAS, Ray and Claire's love for one another grew, and it became apparent that they would spend the rest of their lives together; and WHEREAS, Ray and Claire were joined in marriage on April 4, 1964 at St. James Catholic Church; and WHEREAS, Ray, then an officer in the United States Marine Corp, and Claire, the former golden girl turned preschool teacher, were a perfect couple; and WHEREAS, Ray's service in the United States Marine Corp took the young couple to North Carolina, California, and Virginia, and Ray ultimately obtained the rank of Lieutenant Colonel; and WHEREAS, the Gendrons welcomed their first child, Stephen Scott, on April 10, 1966; their only daughter, Rae Elizabeth, on September 11, 1967; and their second son, Joseph Vance, on December 5, 1976; and WHEREAS, after his military service, Ray embarked on a thirty-five year career with Kaiser Aluminum and related entities, serving as a plant manager, vice president, and ENROLLEDHCR NO. 30 Page 2 of 2 general manager in Washington state, Jamaica, and Louisiana, which provided his family with enriching and wonderful experiences and memories; and WHEREAS, the Gendrons' love for the culture and people of Louisiana eventually led them back home where they retired and have been permanent Baton Rouge residents since 2003 and now spend their time focused on family and friends; and WHEREAS, their family has grown to include eight delightful grandchildren, Jane Anne Gendron, Sophie Marie Gendron, Ashley Grace Gendron, Natalie Claire Gendron, Justin Campbell Best, Jacob Christian Best, Macy Elizabeth Gendron, and Samuel Joseph Gendron; and two wonderful daughters-in-law, Paige Hodges Gendron and Megan LaForge Gendron; and WHEREAS, Ray and Claire have always put family first as demonstrated by their excellent attendance and support at their children's, and now grandchildren's, school functions, recitals, and sporting events; and WHEREAS, the Gendrons' love for one another is truly a special one which has endured throughout their many years together, through both the good times and the bad; and WHEREAS, the golden wedding anniversary of Ray and Claire Gendron is a joyous and memorable occasion that merits sincere congratulations. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend and congratulate Ray and Claire Gendron upon the celebration of their fiftieth wedding anniversary, does hereby express enduring appreciation for the tremendous pride and honor they bring to their family, friends, community, and state, and does hereby extend very best wishes to this wonderful couple for continued happiness and richest blessings as they enjoy their future years together. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted to Ray and Claire Gendron. SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE