House | 06/02/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |