Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Reported with amendments (16-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|