Senate | 04/29/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 70, nays 15. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Reported with amendments (12-5). | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |