House
|
05/20/2014
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|