House | 04/21/2014 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 4/15/2014. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Approved on 4/15/2014. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/7/2014. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Request study by the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/3/2014. | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Sent to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Study request list distributed to members on 3/31/2014. | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Received on 3/11/2014. |