House | 06/05/2014 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, adopted. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Reported with amendments (11-0). | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |