House | 06/05/2014 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, adopted. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |