House | 06/05/2014 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 56, nays 37. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |