Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR198 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            ENROLLED
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 198
BY REPRESENTATIVE JOHNSON
A RESOLUTION
To commend Cynthia Dauzat upon the occasion of her retirement as city clerk for the City
of Bunkie after thirty-two years of  service.
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat was hired as deputy city clerk for Bunkie on May 3,
1982, and served in that position through September 13, 1993, when she was appointed city
clerk for Bunkie on September 14, 1993; and 
WHEREAS, at the time of her retirement on May thirty-first of this year, Cynthia
Dauzat will have served the City of Bunkie for a total of thirty-two years; and 
WHEREAS, during her time with the City of Bunkie, Cynthia Dauzat completed the
annual Louisiana Clerks Institute held in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, where she received the
designation of Certified Municipal Clerk from the International Institute of Municipal Clerks
on November 4, 1988; and 
WHEREAS, after further education through the Louisiana Clerks Institute and
various regional meetings, Cynthia Dauzat was also awarded the title of Certified Municipal
Clerk/Advanced Academy of Education on October 25, 1999, by the International Institute
of Municipal Clerks; and 
WHEREAS, on February 28, 2000, Cynthia Dauzat received the lifetime designation
of Master Municipal Clerk from  the International Institute of Municipal Clerks, a new
designation and  the highest recognition that a city clerk can receive; and 
WHEREAS, during her years as city clerk, Cynthia Dauzat also served as president
of the Louisiana Municipal Clerks for the years 2000 to 2001, in addition to serving  on its
various committees throughout the years; and 
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat also had the honor of  serving  as the city clerk board
member on the Louisiana Municipal Advisory and Technical Services Board, along with ENROLLEDHR NO. 198
Page 2 of 2
mayors and aldermen throughout the state, from November 6, 2002, through May 31, 2014;
and 
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat also served as president for four years, from 2006
through 2010, of such Louisiana Municipal Advisory and Technical Services Board, which
has the responsibility of administering  the insurance premium tax and occupational license
tax collection program for municipalities throughout this state; and 
WHEREAS, on a personal level, Cynthia Dauzat has been a member of the Bunkie
Rotary Club for nineteen years, since September 1994, serving as its president twice, from
2001 to  2002 and  from 2010 to 2011; and
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat additionally became a Paul Harris Fellow on May 24,
2010, and has served as chairman of Bunkie's Christmas Parade for the last several years.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend Cynthia Dauzat upon the occasion of her
retirement as city clerk for the City of Bunkie after thirty-two years of service.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted
to Cynthia Dauzat.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES