House | 04/02/2014 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Read by title, adopted. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Reported favorably (17-0). | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |