House | 06/04/2014 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Reported with amendments (5-0). | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |