House | 04/28/2014 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |