House | 06/05/2014 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2014 | Read by title, adopted. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |