LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR5
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR5
Action History
House
06/02/2014
Approved on 6/2/2014.
House
05/30/2014
Study request list distributed to members on 5/30/2014.
House
05/29/2014
Received on 5/29/2014.