House | 04/29/2014 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Reported favorably (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |