Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 571.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|