Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date 8/1/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 855.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Pierre, Cromer, and Thierry.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Long, Morrish, and Johns.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|