Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date 6/23/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 856.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Lopinto, Simon, and Hazel.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, Heitmeier, and Gallot.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|