Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Effective date 8/1/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 377.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|