House | 05/29/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2014 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |