Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Leger, Arnold, and Adams.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, White, and Gary Smith.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 03 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|