Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Effective date 8/1/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 697.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 26. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported favorably (10-6). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 18 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 19 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|