House | 05/30/2014 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/30/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2014. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Reported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |