Senate | 05/06/2014 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 25 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and nays. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |