House | 05/07/2014 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |