Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Effective date 7/1/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 708.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Reported favorably (17-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|