LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB463
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB463
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB463
Action History
Senate
03/26/2014
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Senate
03/25/2014
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Senate
03/24/2014
Reported favorably.
Senate
03/10/2014
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Senate
02/28/2014
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.