Senate
|
06/06/2014
|
Effective date 6/6/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 544.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 39. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported with amendments (13-6). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|