Senate | 04/16/2014 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 25 nays. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |