LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB499
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB499
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB499
Action History
Senate
04/07/2014
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
04/03/2014
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
04/02/2014
Reported with amendments.
Senate
03/10/2014
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Senate
02/28/2014
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.