Senate | 05/13/2014 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 16 yeas and 23 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for May 12, 2014. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 05/08/2014. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |