House | 04/21/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 15 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |