Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Brown, Arnold, and Broadwater.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Gallot, Dorsey-Colomb, and Tarver.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 33. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|