Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Effective date 6/19/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 764.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Reported favorably (9-2). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 263. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|