Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 765.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|