Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 31, nays 61. The Conference Committee Report was rejected.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Badon, Moreno, and Leger.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Dorsey-Colomb, and Peacock.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|