House | 04/21/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |