Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Effective date 6/12/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 606.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|