House | 05/20/2014 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2014 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |