Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Effective date 6/18/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 723.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Reported favorably (7-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|