Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date 6/23/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 853.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Edwards, Carter, and Broadwater.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Appel, and White.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 15. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Reported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|